Seifer, Zachary Shane (CPSO#: 104094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
666 Burnhamthorpe Rd
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON  M9C2Z4
Phone: 4166220933
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Bay St.
Toronto ON  M5J 2J1
Canada
Phone: (416) 368-6787
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seifer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Seifer ( CPSO# 104094)

Business Address:
200 Bay Street
Lower Concourse Level
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 566-6798

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (416) 566-6798

Business Address:
666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M9C 2Z4
Phone Number: (416) 622-0933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZACHARY SHANE SEIFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIFER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016