Sekar, Arni Somnathiyer Chandra (CPSO#: 29518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.S. Sekar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 9 2018

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical record requests should be directed to: sekarclinic@gmail.com
Date Received: 27 Mar 2018


Instructions: Medical record requests should be directed to: radhikasekar@yahoo.com
Date Received: 21 Nov 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 22, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Arni Somnathiyer
            Chandra Sekar, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sekar
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Sekar has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.