Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sekely, Istvan (CPSO#: 59854)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway West
Suite 111
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sekely Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sekely ( CPSO# 59854 )

Business Address:
Suite 111
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-9228

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISTVAN SEKELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEKELY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1989