Seki, John Toshihiko (CPSO#: 66811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
4337 Burnside Line
Severn ON  L3V 0W1
Phone: (705) 325-6805
Fax: (705) 325-9402
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.T. Seki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seki ( CPSO# 66811 )
Dr. N. Rowhani-Seki ( CPSO# 66874 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
4337 Burnside Line
Orillia ON  L3V 0W1
Phone Number: (705) 325-6805

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN TOSHIHIKO SEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 14 Aug 1995
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Nov 1999 to 30 Nov 1999
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 2000 to 30 Apr 2000
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002