Sekyi-Otu, Ato (CPSO#: 62354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 48 Building D
2140 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 454-7924
Fax: (905) 454-7926
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATO SEKYI-OTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEKYI-OTU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991