Selbie, Adrienne Naomi (CPSO#: 100876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton,ON
Hamilton ON  L8M1W9
Phone: 905-777-3837 Ext. 12250
Fax: 905-549-6829
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrienne Selbie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Selbie ( CPSO# 100876)

Business Address:
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE NAOMI SELBIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELBIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2016