Selby, Deborah Mary (CPSO#: 60772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
KGE31
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Imrie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Selby ( CPSO# 60772 )
Dr. K. Imrie ( CPSO# 59793 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room-D474
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5145


Corporation Name: D Selby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Selby ( CPSO# 60772 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
KGE31
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH MARY SELBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELBY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1992