Selchen, Daniel Haim (CPSO#: 51613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Third Floor
Shuter Wing, Room 001
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5855
Fax: (416) 864-5581
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Multiple Sclerosis clinic
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5377
Fax: 4168645378
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel H. Selchen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Selchen ( CPSO# 51613 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5855

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL HAIM SELCHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELCHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985