Selhi, Zoe (CPSO#: 100057)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 100 802 New Holland Avenue Lancaster, PA 17601 USA
Date Received: 06 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014