Seli Uzelac, Antonia (CPSO#: 72531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Seli, Antonia (used until: 17 Jun 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4805
Fax: (905) 845-6419
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Seli Uzelac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Seli Uzelac ( CPSO# 72531 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIA SELI UZELAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELI UZELAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003