Selim, Ayman Mohamed Mohamed Ali (CPSO#: 99311)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2012 to 08 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 09 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2014 to 31 May 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2015