Selk, Amanda (CPSO#: 81108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Gynaecology Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7744
Fax: (416) 323-6237
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
3rd floor
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Canada
Phone: (647) 826-8028
Fax: (647) 826-8027
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanda Selk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Selk ( CPSO# 81108 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Gynaecology Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7744

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
3rd Floor
Room 3-228
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (647) 826-8028

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA SELK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2007 to 14 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009