Sell Marucco, Erick Fernando (CPSO#: 78114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Feb 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma de Centro America, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3467
Fax: (613) 738-4879
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sell Marucco Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sell Marucco ( CPSO# 78114 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Feb 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 21 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Erik  Fernando  Sell  Marucco  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            paediatric neurology.