Sellens, Catherine Anne (CPSO#: 67935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
Hamilton General Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANNE SELLENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELLENS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000