Sellers, Elizabeth Ann Cameron (CPSO#: 65507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winnipeg Children's Hospital
F E 307 - 685 William Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3E 0Z2
Phone: (204) 787-7435
Fax: (204) 787-1655

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN CAMERON SELLERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELLERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993