Seltzer, Allan Zangwill (CPSO#: 42578)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2006

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Feb 2009
Summary:

On February 2, 2009, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Seltzer to have committed acts of professional 
misconduct in that he:  

     1. Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of 
        Patient A.  
     2. Discontinued professional services to Patient B that were needed, without the patient 
        requesting the discontinuation, without arranging alternative services and without giving the 
        patient a reasonable opportunity to arrange alternative services.  
     3. Contravened a regulation made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in relation to his failure to 
        keep a record for Patient B.  
     4. Engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all 
        the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable 
        or unprofessional, in relation to giving contradictory and misleading statements to the College 
        regarding the records of Patient B.  

With respect to Patient A, the Committee found that Dr. Seltzer failed to maintain the standard of practice 
of the profession by failing to maintain adequate records, and failing to recognize and respond adequately 
to Patient A's substance dependence disorder. With respect to Patient B, the Committee found that Dr. 
Seltzer discontinued professional services that were needed without Patient B requesting discontinuation 
and without arranging alternative services; failed to maintain adequate records; and provided inconsistent 
and contradictory responses to requests for Patient B's records.   

On June 17, 2009, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:  

     1. Dr. Seltzer appear before the panel to be reprimanded.   
     2. The results of this proceeding be recorded in the Register.  
     3. The Registrar be directed to suspend Dr. Seltzer's certification of registration for a period of 
        six months.  
     4. The Registrar be directed to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on his 
        certificate of registration:   
         a. Dr. Seltzer be required to complete, at his own expense, the Medical Record Keeping for 
            Physicians and the Medical Ethics and Informed Consent courses at the College;  
         b. Dr. Seltzer be required to complete, at his own expense, a program that is approved by 
            the College that establishes that Dr. Seltzer has appropriate knowledge, skill, and 
            judgment to practice psychiatry in the Province of Ontario relating to:  
               i. monitoring patient prescription drug use according to current standards;  
               ii. record keeping; psychopharmacology; which will encompass assessment, 
                  remediation, and reassessment; and  
         c. Dr. Seltzer be required to engage, at his own expense, a Clinical Supervisor who is 
            acceptable to the College, who will supervise Dr. Seltzer's completion of the program 
            identified in 4 b), and who will deliver to the College a written report satisfactory to the 
            College confirming successful completion of the program, and stating that Dr. Seltzer has 
            the required knowledge, skill, and judgment in the areas identified in paragraph 4(b) 
            above [the matters referred to in paragraphs 4 (b) and (c) shall be referred to as the 
            "Remediation Program"].  
          

5. The Registrar shall be directed to impose the following further terms, conditions, and 
   limitations on Dr. Seltzer's certificate of registration:   
    a. Following the successful completion of the Remediation Program, Dr. Seltzer's practice 
       shall be subject to clinical review.  The assessor will review Dr. Seltzer's practice 
       generally, and particularly with respect to the identified areas of deficiency outlined in 
       the Remediation Program.   This review, together with a review of Dr. Seltzer's 
       pharmacological prescribing records, will be performed by an assessor satisfactory to the 
       College, who will report the findings to the College initially at six months after the 
       Remediation Program and, thereafter, at six months intervals for a period  of two years, 
       and then annually for a period of three years;  
    b. Dr. Seltzer will be responsible for all costs associated with these assessments and reports. 
       If the reports are not satisfactory to the College during the period of review, the College 
       will take such actions as are deemed appropriate;  
    c. Dr. Seltzer will provide to the College on an annual basis proof of his participation in 
       continuing medical education in accordance with the guidelines of the Royal College of 
       Physicians and Surgeons of Canada.           
6. Dr. Seltzer pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,950.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 03, 2008

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 24, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Finding and Probation Conditions:

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.

The following sets out finding(s) of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

Allan Z. Seltzer was found guilty, on July 20, 2016, of one count of fraud under $5000, contrary to Section 380 of the Criminal Code of Canada. Seltzer was sentenced to pay a fine of $1,000, a victim surcharge of $300 and a probation period of six months. The probation order prohibits Seltzer from:

a) Representing himself as doctor, “MD”, Psychiatrist, or physician unless properly licensed to do so as per the requirements of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario; or
b) Providing therapy, counselling or treatment to any person in exchange for money or other remuneration; and
c) Dispensing any medication.