Selvakone, Meera (CPSO#: 76502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 780-8823
Fax: (905) 780-8821
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEERA SELVAKONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELVAKONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2003