Selvarajah, Subani (CPSO#: 94505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, Tamil

Education:State University of Leiden, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte road
unit 400
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 825-5999
Fax: (905) 825-8586
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Subani Selvarajah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Selvarajah ( CPSO# 94505 )

Business Address:
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 400
Oakville ON  L6M 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 825-5999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUBANI SELVARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELVARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2013