Selvarajah, Vijeyakumar (CPSO#: 88280)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
PO Box 255 Room LM10
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 76420
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 06 May 2008 to 02 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 2008 to 24 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2008