Selzner, Markus (CPSO#: 83694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Surgery
11 PMB 178
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5884
Fax: (416) 340-5321
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Selzner-Malekkiani & M. Selzner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Selzner-Malekkiani ( CPSO# 83701 )
Dr. M. Selzner ( CPSO# 83694 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Surgery
11 PMB 178
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 02 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2005 to 12 Oct 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Markus Selzner may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Selzner holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Selzner no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.