Sem, Alfred Wai Ming (CPSO#: 60838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416)530-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sem ( CPSO# 60838 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Diagnostic Imaging
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Indiana
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALFRED WAI MING SEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990