Sem, Francis Wai Chun (CPSO#: 67182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Tham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sem ( CPSO# 67182 )
Dr. E. Tham ( CPSO# 67187 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Phone Number: (416) 741-2273


Corporation Name: Francis Sem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sem ( CPSO# 67182 )
Dr. E. Tham ( CPSO# 67187 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6435

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCIS WAI CHUN SEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993