Semchyshyn, Stefan (CPSO#: 24588)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2003