Semczyszyn, Miroslav Volodymyr (CPSO#: 66695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
140 Centennial Parkway North
Hamilton ON  L8E 1H9
Phone: (905) 561-9255
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIROSLAV VOLODYMYR SEMCZYSZYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEMCZYSZYN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995