Semelhago, Gavin Rupert (CPSO#: 60819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
207 Main Street West
Box 890
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Phone: (519) 343-5000
Fax: (519) 343-3544
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gavin Semelhago Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Semelhago ( CPSO# 60819 )

Business Address:
207 Main Street West
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Phone Number: (519) 343-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAVIN RUPERT SEMELHAGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEMELHAGO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990