Semelhago, Lloyd Cajetan (CPSO#: 59470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
General Site
McMaster Clinic, Room 726
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-7168
Fax: (905) 527-0538
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Semelhago Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Semelhago ( CPSO# 59470 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
General Site
McMaster Clinic
726 - 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LLOYD CAJETAN SEMELHAGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEMELHAGO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Resident 8 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1989