Semmler, Robert Thompson (CPSO#: 58546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexander Medical Building
849 Alexander Court
Suite 208
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone: (705) 743-9509
Fax: (705) 743-9509
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Sidney Street Suite2B
Belleville ON  K8P 5E2
Canada
Phone: (613) 966-5725
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT THOMPSON SEMMLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEMMLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jan 1989 to 30 Jan 1989
Elective Trainee - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1988