Semple, John Laurie (CPSO#: 51614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7555
Fax: (416) 323-7710
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN LAURIE SEMPLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEMPLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Research Fellows - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1983