Senathirajah, Niranjana (CPSO#: 64075)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Colombo, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
MARKHAM ONTARIO

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1994 to 31 Oct 1995
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996