Senay, Helene (CPSO#: 58681)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 08 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1990