Sender, Rachelle Rose (CPSO#: 69237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lower Level Unit 1
107 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone: (905) 628-0840
Fax: (905) 628-0843
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Refuge Centre For Newcomer Health
Lower Level
183 Hughson Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 526-0000
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHELLE ROSE SENDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997