Senger, Christof (CPSO#: 74242)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 07 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Wurzburg, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004