Senior, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 72668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hespeler Medical Clinic
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 629-4615
Fax: (519) 629-4630
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan E. Senior Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Senior ( CPSO# 72668 )

Business Address:
Hespeler Medical Clinic
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 629-4615

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH SENIOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENIOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003