Sennikov, Alexei Leonidovich (CPSO#: 93351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Belarussian State Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sennikov and Dr. Karenkova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sennikov ( CPSO# 93351 )
Dr. N. Karenkova ( CPSO# 98413 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2012 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Alexei  Leonidovich  Sennikov may practise medicine independently in
                  Internal Medicine, only.