Senthe, Nileshwa (CPSO#: 72121)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1998 to 30 Apr 1998
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 02 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2007