Senthelal, Sashikala (CPSO#: 63130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7586
Fax: (905) 848-7602
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 711
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 929-0929
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sashikala Senthelal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Senthelal ( CPSO# 63130 )

Business Address:
711 - 600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 929-0929

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7586

Business Address:
Suite 300
2085 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 4G1
Phone Number: (905) 848-7586

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Aug 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SASHIKALA SENTHELAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENTHELAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 28 Aug 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1996