Senthilnathan, Seanthan (CPSO#: 95487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northwestern University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 100 / 105
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: 416-499-3559
Fax: 416-499-4631
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Senthilnathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Senthilnathan ( CPSO# 95487 )

Business Address:
Suites 100/105
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 499-3559

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEANTHAN SENTHILNATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENTHILNATHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017