Sepandj, Farshad (CPSO#: 64247)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1998