Sequeira, Denise (CPSO#: 56872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1245 Danforth Ave.,
Toronto, Ont.,
Toronto ON  M4J 1M8
Phone: (416) 921-2395
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hogg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sequeira ( CPSO# 56872 )
Dr. D. Hogg ( CPSO# 32483 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Suite 5-108
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4521

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISE SEQUEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEQUEIRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1987