Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sequeira, Donovan St Clair (CPSO#: 64059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
630 Peter Robertson Blvd
Suite 15
Brampton ON  L6R 1T4
Phone: (905) 793-8868
Fax: (905) 793-8957
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donovan Sequeira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sequeira ( CPSO# 64059 )

Business Address:
15 - 630 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6R 1T4
Phone Number: (905) 793-8868

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONOVAN ST CLAIR SEQUEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEQUEIRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 12 May 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Sep 2009
Summary:

 On September 18, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sequeira committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Patient A had been Dr. Sequeira's 
 patient since she was 16 years old. At the time of Patient A's final medical appointment with Dr. 
 Sequeira, she was 21, and he was 39 years of age. At the conclusion of that medical appointment, 
 Dr. Sequeira and Patient A discussed meeting socially. Prior to their first date, Dr. Sequeira 
 informed Patient A that she could no longer be his patient. Within four days of his last medical 
 appointment with her, they had dinner together and communicated with each other romantically. By 
 the following month, they engaged in kissing and other physical contact, and by the fourth month 
 following the final medical appointment, they had engaged in sexual intercourse. 

The Discipline 
 Committee ordered and directed that:

1.  The Registrar suspend Dr. Sequeira's certificate of 
 registration for a period of six (6) months, to commence within eight (8) weeks of the date of the 
 Order.
2.  Dr. Sequeira successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics 
 and Informed Consent Course and the College's Boundaries Course, on the next available date, and 
 to provide proof thereof to the College.  
3.  Dr. Sequeira appear before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.
4.  Dr. Sequeira pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650, within 30 days of 
 the date of the Order. 
5.  The results of this proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 18, 2009