Sereda, Andrea Michelle (CPSO#: 86560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Intercommunity Health Centre
659 Dundas St E
London, ON
London ON  N5W 2Z1
Phone: (519) 660-0874
Fax: (519) 642-1532
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Sereda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sereda ( CPSO# 86560 )

Business Address:
London Intercommunity Health Centre
659 Dundas Street East
London ON  N5W 2Z1
Phone Number: (519) 660-0874

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA MICHELLE SEREDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEREDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009