Sergeant, Myles David (CPSO#: 66607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wayside House
15 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton ON  L8P 2B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 528-8969
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonia S. Anand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant ( CPSO# 66607 )
Dr. S. Anand ( CPSO# 65167 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
MDCL Room 3204
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 719-3926


Corporation Name: M. Sergeant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant ( CPSO# 66607 )
Dr. S. Anand ( CPSO# 65167 )

Business Address:
St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Business Address:
Wayside House
15 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton ON  L8P 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYLES DAVID SERGEANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERGEANT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1995