Seropian, Michael Armand (CPSO#: 62219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3181 Sam Jackson Park Road
Portland OR  97239
United States
Phone: 5034185684

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Oregon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ARMAND SEROPIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEROPIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991