Serowka, Pawel Antoni (CPSO#: 73524)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2005