Seshadri, Tara (CPSO#: 85962)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 14 May 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 15 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008