Seski, Robert Charles (CPSO#: 92507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Feb 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Mississippi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-1661 Ext. 52226
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4444
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rob Seski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Seski ( CPSO# 92507 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Hospitalist Office
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-1661

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Jan 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Dec 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Robert Charles Seski may practice medicine independently in Internal
            Medicine as a Hospitalist, only.