Sethi, Rajiv (CPSO#: 65314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
40 Westmore Drive
Toronto ON  M9V 4C2
Phone: (416) 745-7300
Fax: (416) 745-5300
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4600 Highway 7
Suite 225
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (416) 650-0017
Fax: (416) 650-0668
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

4610 Highway 7
Suite 200
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajiv Sethi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2012

Dr. R. Sethi ( CPSO# 65314 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4C2
Phone Number: (416) 745-7300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RAJIV SETHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993