Sethna, Faraz (CPSO#: 110982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  26 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Area Family Health Team
43 Main Street
Zurich ON  N0M 2T0
Phone: 519-236-4314
Fax: 877-658-2141
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Faraz  Sethna  may practise family medicine at Bluewater Area Family
                  Health Team in Zurich,  Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  eighteen  months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Sethna's knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Sethna's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the  on-site
                        assessment of  Dr. Sethna's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on September 27, 2016, and will expire on  or
                  before March 26, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.