Sethna, Rustom Homi (CPSO#: 55275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
377 Church Street
Suite 408
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-5733
Fax: (905) 472-5215
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Sethna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sethna ( CPSO# 55275 )

Business Address:
Suite 408
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-5733

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUSTOM HOMI SETHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETHNA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1988