Severs, Stanley Robert Frederick (CPSO#: 31738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2345
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. R. Severs, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Severs ( CPSO# 31738 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
Owen Sound Surgical Centre
250 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S4
Phone Number: (519) 371-1008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANLEY ROBERT FREDERICK SEVERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEVERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980